NC H115 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on July 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-24 - Ch. SL 2009-342
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on July 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-24 - Ch. SL 2009-342
Summary
Joint DV Committee/Recommendations.
Title
Joint DV Committee/Recommendations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-24 | Ch. SL 2009-342 | |
2009-07-24 | Signed By Gov. 7/24/2009 | |
2009-07-24 | Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Ratified | |
2009-07-22 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-20 | Placed On Cal For 7/21/2009 | |
2009-07-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-20 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/14/2009 | |
2009-07-09 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-21 | Ref To Com On Mental Health & Youth Services | |
2009-04-21 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Placed On Cal For 4/20/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-03-25 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-11 | Ref to the Com on State Government and State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-02-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S223 (Same As) 2011-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H115 |