NC H115 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-31 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-31 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
North Carolina Health Benefit Exchange
Title
North Carolina Health Benefit Exchange
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Brubaker [R] | Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] |
Rep. Patricia McElraft [R] | Rep. Thomas Murry [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 83 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - A3 Glazier\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - A2 Bryant\Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - A1 Bryant\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - A3 Glazier\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - A2 Bryant\Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - A1 Bryant\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-05-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-26 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-25 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-05-25 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-25 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2011-05-25 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-05-25 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-05-17 | Postponed To 5/25/2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Postponed To 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-10 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2011-05-10 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2011-03-30 | Re-ref Com On Insurance | |
2011-03-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-17 | Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2011-02-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |