NC H1174 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Status: Introduced on April 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-30 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Summary
Study/Standards/Disputed Child Custody Cases.
Title
Study/Standards/Disputed Child Custody Cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Alexander [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Nikita Mackey [D] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] |
Rep. William Wainwright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-08 | Ref to the Com on Juvenile Justice, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S872 (Same As) 2009-03-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1174 |