NC H15 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Ch. SL 2019-64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Ch. SL 2019-64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Lexington/Dissolve Utilities Commission
Title
Lexington/Dissolve Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Potts [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Ch. SL 2019-64 | |
2019-06-27 | Ratified | |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-02-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/20/2019 |
2019-02-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-02-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-01-31 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-01-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |