NC H189 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-25 - Adopted
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-25 - Adopted
Summary
UNC BOG Elections.
Title
UNC BOG Elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Dickson [D] | Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
Rep. Timothy Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | Adopted | |
2009-02-24 | Placed On Cal For 2/25/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-02-24 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-18 | Ref To Com On University Board of Governors Nominating | |
2009-02-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H189 |