NC H189 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Info./Child Supp. Orders
Title
Amend Info./Child Supp. Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-08-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-08-19 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-08-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/19/2014 |
2014-08-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2014-08-18 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-08-18 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/20/2014 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Conferees Changed |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Conferees Reappointed |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Conf Rept Withdrawn |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi |
2014-08-18 | House | Conferees Reappointed |
2014-08-18 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2014-08-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/20/2014 |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/18/2014 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Conf Held As Material |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-08-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-08-15 | House | Ruled Material |
2014-08-15 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-08-15 | House | Conferees Reappointed |
2014-08-15 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-01 | House | Fail To Concur - Appoint Conferees Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-01 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-01 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2014-06-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2014 |
2014-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-06-26 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-25 | Engrossed | |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn 1 |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amend Recon A1 |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reconsidered 2nd Reading |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Recall from Engrossing |
2014-06-24 | Engrossed | |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2014 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Health Care Added |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/19/2013 |
2013-03-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-04 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed |