NC H189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Ref To Com On House Select Committee on North Carolina River Quality
Pending: House Select Committee on North Carolina River Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Ref To Com On House Select Committee on North Carolina River Quality
Pending: House Select Committee on North Carolina River Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Water Safety Act
Title
Water Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] | Rep. Holly Grange [R] |
Rep. Deb Butler [D] | Rep. Michele Presnell [R] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - A2 Richardson, W. Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-01-10 - House - A1 Butler Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - A2 Richardson, W. Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-01-10 - House - A1 Butler Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | Ref To Com On House Select Committee on North Carolina River Quality |
2018-02-09 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-01-10 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-01-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-01-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-01-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | Ref To Com On Appropriations |
2017-02-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S222 (Same As) 2017-04-04 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget