NC H191 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Marquis De Lafayette
Title
Honor Marquis De Lafayette
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Earl Jones [D] | Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Diane Parfitt [D] |
Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - R2 For Adopt (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Placed On Cal For 3/1/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2011-03-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S142 (Same As) 2011-02-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate