NC H2 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Ch. SL 2023-11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Ch. SL 2023-11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
2022 Budget Technical Corrections
Title
2022 Budget Technical Corrections
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Warren [R] | Rep. Joe Pike [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Ch. SL 2023-11 | |
2023-04-03 | Signed by Gov. 4/3/2023 | |
2023-03-24 | Pres. To Gov. 3/24/2023 | |
2023-03-23 | Ratified | |
2023-03-22 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-03-22 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2023-03-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/22/2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-15 | House | Ref To Com On Appropriations |
2023-03-15 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-02-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/22/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-02-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-01-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administration Dept.
Aging
Agriculture
Agriculture Dept.
Agritourism
Appropriations
Attorneys
Bladen County
Boards
Boiling Springs
Budgeting
Buildings
Cancer
Capital Spending
Catawba County
Chaptered
Charlotte
Clean Water Trust Fund
Cleveland County
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Office
Community Development
Confidentiality
Conservation
Construction
Contracts
Corporations
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Crop
Davidson County
Davie County
Deq
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
District Attorneys
District Court
Edgecombe County
Education
Elementary Education
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Employment
Engineers & Engineering
Environment
Erwin
Excise
Exhibitions
Firefighters & Firefighting
Forestry
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Gaston County
Grants
Greensboro
Guilford County
Hazardous Substances
Health
Health Services
Higher Education
Human Trafficking
Human Trafficking Comn.
Hyde County
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Insurance
Internet
Law Enforcement
Lincoln County
Local Government
Mecklenburg County
Medicaid
Minors
Municipalities
Nash County
Nonprofit
Occupations
Onslow County
Parks & Recreation Areas
Pender County
Personnel
Poverty
Presented
Privacy
Public
Public Health
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Safety Dept.
Raleigh
Ratified
Research
Robeson County
Rowan County
Salaries & Benefits
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Sheriffs
Smuggling & Trafficking
Social Services
Stanly County
Stem
Stokes County
Students
Substance Abuse
Superior Court
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Teleservices
Tobacco
Tobacco Products
Travel & Tourism
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Utilities
Wake County
Walnut Cove
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources
Wilson County
Youth Programs
Aging
Agriculture
Agriculture Dept.
Agritourism
Appropriations
Attorneys
Bladen County
Boards
Boiling Springs
Budgeting
Buildings
Cancer
Capital Spending
Catawba County
Chaptered
Charlotte
Clean Water Trust Fund
Cleveland County
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Office
Community Development
Confidentiality
Conservation
Construction
Contracts
Corporations
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Crop
Davidson County
Davie County
Deq
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
District Attorneys
District Court
Edgecombe County
Education
Elementary Education
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Employment
Engineers & Engineering
Environment
Erwin
Excise
Exhibitions
Firefighters & Firefighting
Forestry
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Gaston County
Grants
Greensboro
Guilford County
Hazardous Substances
Health
Health Services
Higher Education
Human Trafficking
Human Trafficking Comn.
Hyde County
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Insurance
Internet
Law Enforcement
Lincoln County
Local Government
Mecklenburg County
Medicaid
Minors
Municipalities
Nash County
Nonprofit
Occupations
Onslow County
Parks & Recreation Areas
Pender County
Personnel
Poverty
Presented
Privacy
Public
Public Health
Public Instruction Dept.
Public Safety Dept.
Raleigh
Ratified
Research
Robeson County
Rowan County
Salaries & Benefits
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Sheriffs
Smuggling & Trafficking
Social Services
Stanly County
Stem
Stokes County
Students
Substance Abuse
Superior Court
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Teleservices
Tobacco
Tobacco Products
Travel & Tourism
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Utilities
Wake County
Walnut Cove
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources
Wilson County
Youth Programs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
108A | 54 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108A | 54.3A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108A | 79 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108D | 30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 29.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
132 | 1.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |