NC H209 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-498
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-498
Summary
Sex Offender Registry/Liberties w/ Student.
Title
Sex Offender Registry/Liberties w/ Student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-498 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-05 | Concurred In S Amend | |
2009-08-04 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-04 | Rec To Concur In S Amend | |
2009-08-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-03 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-07-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-25 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Com Sub w/o Prejud | |
2009-02-18 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-02-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H209 |