NC H216 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Informant Statements/Innocence Comm'n Changes
Title
Informant Statements/Innocence Comm'n Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-02 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |