NC H24 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Chimney Rock/Lake Lure Deannex-Annex
Title
Chimney Rock/Lake Lure Deannex-Annex
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-15 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Ch. SL 2021-152 | |
2021-09-16 | Ratified | |
2021-09-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-15 | House | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2021-09-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/15/2021 |
2021-09-08 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-09-08 | House | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2021-09-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/08/2021 |
2021-09-03 | House | Ruled Material |
2021-09-03 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-09-03 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/10/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-09 | House | Ruled Material |
2021-03-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-03-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-23 | House | Serial Referral To Local Government Stricken |
2021-02-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S41 (Same As) 2021-07-15 - Ch. SL 2021-87
Subjects
Annexation
Chaptered
Chimney Rock Village
Cleveland County
Counties
Gaston County
Kings Mountain
Lake Lure (town)
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Ratified
Rutherford County
Shelby
Stanley
Title Change
Chaptered
Chimney Rock Village
Cleveland County
Counties
Gaston County
Kings Mountain
Lake Lure (town)
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Ratified
Rutherford County
Shelby
Stanley
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
160A | 58.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |