NC H278 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
HOAs/Voluntary Prelitigation Mediation
Title
HOAs/Voluntary Prelitigation Mediation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Ch. SL 2013-127 | |
2013-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2013 | |
2013-06-12 | Ratified | |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/23/2013 |
2013-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-10 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2013-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee A, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Filed |