NC H291 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Belhaven Recall Elections
Title
Belhaven Recall Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Concur\Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Ch. SL 2011-156 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In S Amend 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-14 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-14 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-04-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-12 | Placed On Cal For 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-10 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |