NC H299 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Surplus Lines/Premium Tax.-AB
Title
Surplus Lines/Premium Tax.-AB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-10 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S321 (Same As) 2011-06-13 - Ch. SL 2011-120