NC H299 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-21 - Sequential Referral To Finance Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-21 - Sequential Referral To Finance Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Occ.Lic./Private Protective Svcs. Act Changes-AB
Title
Occ.Lic./Private Protective Svcs. Act Changes-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - A1 Burr Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - A1 Burr Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-14 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2016 |
2016-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2015-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed |