NC H302 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DoDEA/Clinical Educators for Student Teaching
Title
DoDEA/Clinical Educators for Student Teaching
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/05/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs |
2017-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |