NC H311 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Household Goods Carriers/ID Markings
Title
Household Goods Carriers/ID Markings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - A1 Stam\Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - A1 Stam\Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-244 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-14 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-10 | Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2011-05-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-05 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-05 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-05-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/5/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-12 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-10 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |