NC H320 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water Resources Flexibility
Title
Water Resources Flexibility
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Becky Carney [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Danny McComas [R] |
Rep. William McGee [R] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-166 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-04 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-14 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-03-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S278 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate