NC H330 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
CivPro/Qualified Immunity for Auto Accident
Title
CivPro/Qualified Immunity for Auto Accident
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Burr [R] | Rep. Christopher Millis [R] | Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] | Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] |
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - A2 Warren Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Burr Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - A2 Warren Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Burr Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-14 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed |