NC H334 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-29 - Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development
Pending: House Commerce and Job Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-29 - Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development
Pending: House Commerce and Job Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sports Agents/DMV Police Authority
Title
Sports Agents/DMV Police Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - A1 Insko\Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - A1 Insko\Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-07 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-07 | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-04-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-24 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-24 | Rec From House | |
2011-03-23 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-03-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-23 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-03-22 | Placed On Cal For 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-14 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-03-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S400 (Same As) 2011-03-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate