NC H340 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amend Appt For Compact on Education/Military
Title
Amend Appt For Compact on Education/Military
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S448 (Same As) 2019-06-21 - Ch. SL 2019-38