NC H363 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-05 - Ch. Res 2009-3
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-05 - Ch. Res 2009-3
Summary
Invite Governor.
Title
Invite Governor.
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Lorene Coates [D] | Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Bob England [D] |
Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Wil Neumann [R] |
Rep. William Owens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-05 | Ch. Res 2009-3 | |
2009-03-05 | Ratified | |
2009-03-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Placed On Cal For 3/4/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Placed On Cal For 3/3/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2009-03-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H363 |