NC H365 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Ch. SL 2011-46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Ch. SL 2011-46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pink Hill Elections
Title
Pink Hill Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Ch. SL 2011-46 | |
2011-04-20 | Ratified | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-18 | Placed On Cal For 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-18 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-16 | Placed On Cal For 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-16 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-05 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-04-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Placed On Cal For 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-31 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-16 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Filed |