NC H369 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Ch. SL 2014-119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Ch. SL 2014-119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal Law Changes
Title
Criminal Law Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Waddell [D] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. James Langdon [R] | Rep. James Dixon [R] |
Rep. George Graham [D] | Rep. Susan Hamilton [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-15 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-08-15 - House - M11 Not Concur M6 Reconsider (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-08-15 - House - M12 Suspend Rules M6 Reconsider (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-15 - House - M11 Not Concur M6 Reconsider (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-08-15 - House - M12 Suspend Rules M6 Reconsider (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 9 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Ch. SL 2014-119 | |
2014-09-18 | Signed by Gov. 9/18/2014 | |
2014-08-15 | Pres. To Gov. 8/15/2014 | |
2014-08-15 | Ratified | |
2014-08-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-08-15 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-08-15 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2014-08-15 | House | Reconsidered Concurrence |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-31 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2014-07-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-31 | House | Reptd Unfav For Conc |
2014-07-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/30/2014 |
2014-07-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/29/2014 |
2014-07-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/28/2014 |
2014-07-24 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-24 | Engrossed | |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A9 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A8 |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-17 | Engrossed | |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A7 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A6 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A5 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2014 |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2014 |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2013 |
2013-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-04-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S455 (Same As) 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-345