NC H388 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Durham/Electronic School Zones
Title
Durham/Electronic School Zones
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Forde-Hawkins [D] | Rep. Vernetta Alston [D] | Rep. Robert Reives [D] | Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1 |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S239 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Durham
Durham County
Education
Emergency Services
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Local
Local Government
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Pilot Programs
Roads & Highways
School Buildings
Speed Limit
Traffic Control Devices
Traffic Offenses
Transportation
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Durham
Durham County
Education
Emergency Services
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Local
Local Government
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Pilot Programs
Roads & Highways
School Buildings
Speed Limit
Traffic Control Devices
Traffic Offenses
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 302 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 401 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 141.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 36-65 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
C | IX-may | (n/a) | Citation Text |