NC H407 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
NC Semiquincentennial Legislative Commission
Title
NC Semiquincentennial Legislative Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-20 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S609 (Same As) 2023-04-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Appointments
Commissions
Cultural Resources
General Assembly
Membership
President Pro Tempore
Public
Reporting
Semiquincentennial Comn.
Speaker
Commissions
Cultural Resources
General Assembly
Membership
President Pro Tempore
Public
Reporting
Semiquincentennial Comn.
Speaker
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 3.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |