NC H410 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Ch. SL 2011-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Ch. SL 2011-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pinebluff/Preserve Land for Parks
Title
Pinebluff/Preserve Land for Parks
Sponsors
Rep. James Boles [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Ch. SL 2011-133 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-12 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-04-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-12 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-07 | Placed On Cal For 4/11/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-21 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Filed |