NC H411 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Ch. SL 2009-39
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Ch. SL 2009-39
Summary
Comm. of Indian Affairs Interim Appointments.
Title
Comm. of Indian Affairs Interim Appointments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Ch. SL 2009-39 | |
2009-05-27 | Signed By Gov. 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Pres. To Gov. 5/22/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Ratified | |
2009-05-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-20 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-04-20 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Placed On Cal For 4/16/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-05 | Ref To Com On Federal Relations and Indian Affairs | |
2009-03-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H411 |