NC H432 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Swine in Transport/Regulate Feral Swine
Title
Swine in Transport/Regulate Feral Swine
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Larry Bell [D] | Rep. William Brisson [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] |
Rep. James Dixon [R] | Rep. Stephen LaRoque [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Efton Sager [R] |
Rep. Roger West [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-369 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-06-14 | Engrossed | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-20 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-20 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-12 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2011-04-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-08 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Placed On Cal For 4/7/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-23 | Ref To Com On Agriculture | |
2011-03-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |