NC H453 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-01 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-01 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Correct Taxation of Computer Software
Title
Correct Taxation of Computer Software
Sponsors
Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Michael Hager [R] | Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. Timothy Moore [R] |
Rep. Michele Presnell [R] | Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations Subcommittee on Information Technology, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S490 (Same As) 2013-07-10 - Ch. SL 2013-259