NC H454 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concord/Distribution of ABC Net Profits
Title
Concord/Distribution of ABC Net Profits
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Baker [R] | Rep. Kevin Crutchfield [R] | Rep. Diamond Staton-Williams [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Abc Boards
Alcoholic Beverages
Boards
Budgeting
Cabarrus County
Concord
Counties
Emergency Services
Funding
Law Enforcement
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Session Laws
Alcoholic Beverages
Boards
Budgeting
Cabarrus County
Concord
Counties
Emergency Services
Funding
Law Enforcement
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Session Laws