NC H467 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish State Board of Prop
Title
Establish State Board of Prop
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement |
2019-04-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-03 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-03 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |