NC H478 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Ch. SL 2017-32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Ch. SL 2017-32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Required Experience for MH/DD/SAS QPs
Title
Required Experience for MH/DD/SAS QPs
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Dobson [R] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. William Brisson [R] |
Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. Holly Grange [R] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Ch. SL 2017-32 | |
2017-06-08 | Signed by Gov. 6/8/2017 | |
2017-06-01 | Pres. To Gov. 6/1/2017 | |
2017-05-31 | Ratified | |
2017-05-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-30 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-05-24 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-27 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed |