NC H480 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-19 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Reduce Infant Mortality and Preterm Births.
Title
Reduce Infant Mortality and Preterm Births.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-03-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-09 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S243 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-234
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H480 |