NC H484 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Servicemembers Civil Relief Act
Title
Servicemembers Civil Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2017-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/27/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV |
2017-04-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2017-04-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Judiciary I |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S405 (Same As) 2017-03-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate