NC H486 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
National Guard Education Assistance Changes
Title
National Guard Education Assistance Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-155 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2017-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Education - Community Colleges |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S400 (Same As) 2017-03-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate