NC H507 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Fights/Criminalize Attendance of Minor
Title
Animal Fights/Criminalize Attendance of Minor
Sponsors
Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Carson Smith [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Deb Butler [D] |
Rep. Jerry Carter [R] | Rep. Allison Dahle [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - A1 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed |