NC H51 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Serial Referral To Finance Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Serial Referral To Finance Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Eastern Counties/Public Notices
Title
Eastern Counties/Public Notices
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Penny [R] | Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Keith Kidwell [R] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2021-03-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Local Government |
2021-02-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Beaufort County
Bertie County
Camden County
Carteret County
Chowan County
Counties
Craven County
Electronic Government
Fees
Gates County
Harnett County
Hertford County
Information Technology
Internet
Local
Local Government
Media
Notification
Pasquotank County
Perquimans County
Tyrrell County
Washington County
Bertie County
Camden County
Carteret County
Chowan County
Counties
Craven County
Electronic Government
Fees
Gates County
Harnett County
Hertford County
Information Technology
Internet
Local
Local Government
Media
Notification
Pasquotank County
Perquimans County
Tyrrell County
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 602.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 52.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 33 | (n/a) | Citation Text |