NC H519 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Tri-County CC/Neighbor State In-State Tuition
Title
Tri-County CC/Neighbor State In-State Tuition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-30 | House | Ref To Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed |