NC H52 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
Pending: House Judiciary Subcommittee A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
Pending: House Judiciary Subcommittee A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The Castle Doctrine
Title
The Castle Doctrine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-03-22 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-02-09 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-02-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S34 (Same As) 2011-05-31 - Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee C