NC H539 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
MAP 21 Conforming Revisions
Title
MAP 21 Conforming Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-04-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Government, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S659 (Same As) 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-348