NC H548 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Conforming Changes/Constitutional Amend
Title
Conforming Changes/Constitutional Amend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - A1 Bryan Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - A1 Bryan Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-30 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-30 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary IV |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Rules Suspended |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |