NC H551 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Ch. SL 2009-43
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Ch. SL 2009-43
Summary
Davidson/Taking of Foxes.
Title
Davidson/Taking of Foxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Ch. SL 2009-43 | |
2009-05-28 | Ratified | |
2009-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-31 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-03-31 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Placed On Cal For 3/26/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-12 | Ref To Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2009-03-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H551 |