NC H551 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Wilmington Firefighters' Relief Fund
Title
Amend Wilmington Firefighters' Relief Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Ch. SL 2013-222 | |
2013-06-27 | Ratified | |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On State Personnel |
2013-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-02 | House | Serial Referral To State Personnel Added |
2013-05-02 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2013-04-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |