NC H561 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-10 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-10 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
No DOT Medians on Certain Roads
Title
No DOT Medians on Certain Roads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-03 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2011-05-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-03 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-31 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2011-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Filed |