NC H566 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Ch. SL 2015-212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Ch. SL 2015-212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Eyewitness ID/Show-Up
Title
Amend Eyewitness ID/Show-Up
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-03 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-07-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - A1 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-07-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - A1 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | Ch. SL 2015-212 | |
2015-08-11 | Signed by Gov. 8/11/2015 | |
2015-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2015 | |
2015-08-04 | Ratified | |
2015-08-03 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-08-03 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-08-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-08-03 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-30 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015 |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |