NC H581 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Drivers License Designation/Autism
Title
Drivers License Designation/Autism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-13 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-10 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2021-04-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Developmental Disabilities
Dmv
Drivers Licenses
Id Systems
Licenses & Permits
Mental Health
Motor Vehicles
Public
Dmv
Drivers Licenses
Id Systems
Licenses & Permits
Mental Health
Motor Vehicles
Public
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17C | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17E | 4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 7 | (n/a) | Citation Text |