NC H582 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-24 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-24 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Felony Firearms Act/Increase Penalties
Title
Amend Felony Firearms Act/Increase Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. William Cook [R] | Rep. Leo Daughtry [R] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Dan Ingle [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. William McGee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-24 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Placed On Cal For 5/23/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-04 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Filed |