NC H593 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modify Good Cause Waivers
Title
Modify Good Cause Waivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-114 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-09 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-09 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-09 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2010-07-09 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Amend Adopted # 2 | |
2010-07-08 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-22 | Re-ref Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |